BURSTOW WILDLIFE SANCTUARY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Burstow Wildlife Sanctuary aims to provide for the rescue, care and rehabilitation of wildlife and domestic animals. Where possible wildlife is returned to its natural habitat or in the case of domestic animals new caring and vetted homes are found. If it is not possible to achieve this then a safe and secure home is provided by the sanctuary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
Governance
- 11 August 1989: Standard registration
- 07 April 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | 30/04/2005 | 30/04/2006 | 30/04/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.74k | £1.55k | £1.44k | £1.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.98k | £12.85k | £41.90k | £8.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | 13 March 2008 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | 08 February 2008 | 345 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | 08 February 2008 | 345 days late | |
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | 14 February 2008 | 716 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | 14 February 2008 | 716 days late | |
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 14 February 2008 | 1081 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | 14 February 2008 | 1081 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD MAY 1989
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN REFUGES OR RESCUE HOMES OR ANIMAL HOSPITALS OR SANCTUARIES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF INJURED OR UNWANTED ANIMALS OR ANY SPECIES AND THE TREATMENT OF SICK OR ILL-TREATED ANIMALS OF ANY SPECIES. (II) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS OF ANY SPECIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window