THE NORFOLK GARDENS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monitoring and preserving the historic gardens of Norfolk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 30 August 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VANESSA TREVELYAN | Chair | 07 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
Louise Rice | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
Hilary Talbot | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
JAMES MARCUS WARREN | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Lloyd | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Susan ROE | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Sally Louise BATE | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MATTHEW THOMAS MARTIN | Trustee | 26 April 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.14k | £31.60k | £44.07k | £23.02k | £20.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.20k | £27.81k | £39.47k | £28.25k | £21.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 DECEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS CONNECTED WITH THE ARTS AND SCIENCES OF GARDEN LAND. (B) TO PRESERVE ENHANCE AND RE-CREATE FOR THE EDUCATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC WHATEVER GARDEN LAND MAY EXIST OT HAVE EXISTED IN AND AROUND NORFOLK.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILL HOUSE
WACTON
NORWICH
NR15 2UE
- Phone:
- 01111530472
- Email:
- norfolkgtrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window