GURU NANAK FOUNDATION GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities at different venues. Punjabi classes and music classes. Produce and distribute free literature to spread the message of Guru Nanak to the whole mankind. Make donations to help poor schools and poor children to study in India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout London
- Canada
- India
- United States
Governance
- 07 November 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JASBIR KAUR SIDHU | Chair |
|
|
|||||
AMARPAL SINGH NARANG | Trustee | 25 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
JASWANT SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JYOTINDER KAUR VIRDEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.73k | £5.69k | £4.38k | £3.24k | £7.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.08k | £5.26k | £8.16k | £782 | £7.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 October 2024 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 353 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF CHARITABLE TRUST DATED 20TH SEPTEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR THE TEACHINGS OF GURU NANAK AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 ROSEMARY AVENUE
HOUNSLOW
TW4 7JQ
- Phone:
- 02085706845
- Email:
- jkaursidhu@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window