Accounts and annual returns THE SIR JAMES BLACK SCHOLARSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 802012
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2012 24 September 2013 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2011 26 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not Required