GUILD OF ONE-NAME STUDIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the education of the public in one-name studies (defined as research into the genealogy and family history of all persons with the same surname and its variants). Promote the preservation and publication of the resultant data and to maximise its accessibility to interested members of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Austria
- Barbados
- Belgium
- Canada
- China
- Denmark
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Israel
- Kuwait
- Malta
- Monaco
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Philippines
- Portugal
- Scotland
- Singapore
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Thailand
- United States
Governance
- 21 September 1989: Standard registration
- 13 March 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 13 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1197944 GUILD OF ONE-NAME STUDIES CIO
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.38k | £66.98k | £101.52k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.24k | £51.07k | £216.68k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 07 February 2022 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 141 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAY 1987 AS AMENDED 2 SEPTEMBER 1989, 9 MAY 1992, 9 JULY 1994, 22 APRIL 1995, 30 MARCH 1996, 7 DECEMBER 1996 AND 8 APRIL 2006. as amended on 21 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ONE-NAME STUDIES, THIS BEING DEFINED FOR PURPOSE OF THIS CONSTITUTION AS RESEARCH INTO THE GENEALOGY AND FAMILY HISTORY OF ALL PERSONS WITH THE SAME SURNAME AND ITS VARIANTS B. TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTANT DATA, AND TO MAXIMISE ITS ACCESSIBILITY TO INTERESTED MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window