Governing document GUILD OF ONE-NAME STUDIES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAY 1987 AS AMENDED 2 SEPTEMBER 1989, 9 MAY 1992, 9 JULY 1994, 22 APRIL 1995, 30 MARCH 1996, 7 DECEMBER 1996 AND 8 APRIL 2006. as amended on 21 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ONE-NAME STUDIES, THIS BEING DEFINED FOR PURPOSE OF THIS CONSTITUTION AS RESEARCH INTO THE GENEALOGY AND FAMILY HISTORY OF ALL PERSONS WITH THE SAME SURNAME AND ITS VARIANTS B. TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTANT DATA, AND TO MAXIMISE ITS ACCESSIBILITY TO INTERESTED MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.