THE CONGREGATION OF THE BLESSED SACRAMENT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Catholic Religious activities in Liverpool and Glasgow. Liverpool Shrine is in Dawson Street and the Parish in Glasgow is in Govan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Liverpool City
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 October 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev George Dunne SSS | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Melville Wright SSS | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Darren Maslen | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Dowling sss | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £234.10k | £195.69k | £196.46k | £234.64k | £243.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £371.30k | £240.91k | £236.67k | £318.39k | £157.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 December 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2022 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2022 | 199 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH AUGUST 1989 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION DATED 25TH SEPTEMBER 1990.
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON PROMOTED OR SUPPORTED BY THE CONGREGATION OF THE BLESSED SACRAMENT AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FORM TIME TO TIME WITH THE CONSENT OF THE PROVINCIAL SUPERIOR THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT IF AT ANY TIME THE CONGREGATION OF THE BLESSED SACRAMENT SHALL CEASE TO EXIST OR TO CARRY ON PROMOTE OR SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE WORKS THE TRUST FUND AND THE INCOME THERE OF SHALL BE HELD FOR SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN CONNECTION WITH THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 BACHELORS WALK
DUBLIN 1
Dublin 1
D01 NW14
- Phone:
- 0035318724597
- Email:
- sssdublin@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window