THE GEORGE FRANKS TRUST

Charity number: 802093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOPSES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £2,100

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Antigua And Barbuda
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 September 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE GEORGE FRANKS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucy Snowden Trustee 02 January 2019
None on record
INGRID PATRICIA FRANKS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.10k £50 £1.40k £300 £2.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 17 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 17 August 2024 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 17 August 2024 559 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 11 March 2022 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE OLD VICARAGE
SUTTON
WOODBRIDGE
IP12 3DT
Phone:
01394411206
Website:

No information available