THE SOCIETY OF THE WORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society of the Work aims at the advancement of religion in accordance with the Roman Catholic faith, the advancement of education and the relief of poor, aged or infirm persons. It concentrates on promoting the work of Saint John Henry Newman and is the custodian of The College where Newman lived from 1842 to 1846, keeping it open almost daily, free of charge, to members of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 November 1989: Standard registration
- THE SOCIETY OF THE WORK THE FRIENDS OF THE COLLEGE AT NEWMAN'S LITTLEMORE (Working name)
- THE SOCIETY OF THE WORK WITH INTERNATIONAL CENTRE OF NEWMAN FRIENDS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Paul Shrimpton | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Martin Deak | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tobias Edward Hamilton Bellhouse | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sr Monika Mader | Trustee | 19 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Joseph Clarke | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SR BIANCA FEUERSTEIN | Trustee | 08 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
SR INGRID SWINNEN | Trustee | 08 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEORGE PITT-PAYNE FCA | Trustee | 31 March 2003 |
|
|
||||
SR BIRGIT DECHANT | Trustee | 12 April 2001 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £313.41k | £40.67k | £37.71k | £220.77k | £42.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.03k | £65.89k | £68.42k | £86.52k | £92.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11TH SEPTEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. (C) THE RELIEF OF POOR AGED OR INFIRM PERSONS AND IN PARTICULAR THE TRUSTEES MAY TAKE SUCH STEPS AS THEY SHALL THINK FIT TO PUBLISH AND OTHERWISE MAKE KNOWN THE WORKS AND TEACHINGS OF CARDINAL JOHN HENRY NEWMAN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
AMBROSE COTTAGE
9 COLLEGE LANE
LITTLEMORE
OXFORD
OX4 4LQ
- Phone:
- 01865779743
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window