THE JERUSALEM EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funding for religious school for "at risk" boys in Jerusalem, Israel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Israel
Governance
- 02 November 1989: Standard registration
- 29 November 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.60k | £3.00k | £2.60k | £1.20k | £900 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £3.00k | £1.60k | £3.00k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 11 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 24 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 09 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 24 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4TH SEPTEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE SUPPORT OF AN INSTITUTION TO BE KNOWN AS "ATERET YERUSHALAYIM" WHICH IS TO BASED IN JERUSALEM, ISRAEL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window