Financial history THE MAGOG TRUST

Charity number: 802150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £138.29k £161.14k £180.09k £156.25k £145.36k
Total expenditure £115.36k £115.95k £142.95k £128.19k £135.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £29.08k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £46.84k £22.70k £29.08k £17.49k £16.19k