FRIENDS OF OAKHILL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate a number of fund raising activities based around Oakhill Primary School. The funds raised from these activities are spent on activities, goods and services at the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 30 October 1989: Standard registration
- FOSA (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF OAKHILL SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Helen Morgan | Chair | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Lisa Demeza | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rose Pemberton | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jasmin Burnett | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.61k | £3.54k | £6.51k | £15.24k | £22.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.30k | £2.35k | £7.97k | £19.93k | £19.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £400 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 July 2024 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 13TH SEPTEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAKHILL SCHOOL
ALDERS AVENUE
WOODFORD GREEN
ESSEX
IG8 9PY
- Phone:
- 02085273309
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window