Accounts and annual returns THE BURA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 802176
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 July 2007 181 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 02 April 2008 427 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 04 April 2008 794 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 02 April 2008 792 days late