Accounts and annual returns YOUNG RISERS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 802191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 March 2024 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 March 2024 149 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 September 2023 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 September 2023 310 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window