YOUNG RISERS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Young Risers provides term time only pre-school alliance provision for 2-5 year olds, Monday to Friday, 9am-3pm. The setting is registered for government funding for all 3 year olds, and for 2 year olds from low income families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £90,522 from 40 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Kent
Governance
- 30 October 1989: Standard registration
- YOUNG RISERS ACCREDITED PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- YOUNG RISERS PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley Smith | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|||
Chelsea Rowlands | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|||
Emma Lavelle | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||
Sarah Penfold | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||
Faye Miller | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.40k | £96.96k | £103.21k | £107.65k | £112.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.25k | £74.84k | £101.01k | £143.77k | £123.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £91.22k | £77.05k | £90.52k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2024 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 March 2024 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2023 | 310 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2023 | 310 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEB 1988 AS AMENDED ON 08 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY: A. PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART. B. ENCOURAGE OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN. C. FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
ISTEAD RISE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Young Risers Pre-School
Annexe of
Istead Rise Primary School
Downs Road
Istead Rise
Kent
- Phone:
- 01474 832205
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window