STREATHAM CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The choir, which is based at St Leonard's Church, Tooting Bec Gardens, Streatham, London SW16, performs three/four public concerts a year to promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 13 November 1989: Standard registration
- THE STREATHAM PHILHARMONIC CHORAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMANUEL CLAUDE BOUYER | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Myles Osborn-Banton | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Ridout | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Augustina Dias | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Lucy Wareham | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Hartland | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Richardson-Bunbury | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Reynard | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Taylor | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Johnson | Trustee | 04 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALICE MARY TURVEY | Trustee | 04 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE HARRISON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.76k | £3.36k | £37.99k | £52.41k | £58.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.26k | £4.43k | £35.69k | £44.49k | £62.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH MARCH 1989 AS AMENDED 28TH FEBRUARY 2000. AMENDED 11TH NOVEMBER 2002 as amended on 09 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 8
30 Streatham Place
LONDON
SW2 4QY
- Phone:
- 07958260060
- Email:
- streathamchoral@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window