FRIENDS OF THE ABBEY JMI SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils at the school by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education at the school (not normally provided by the LEA).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 14 December 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alice Harriet Clarissa Toon | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Annie Sitton | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Murduck | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie McEvoy | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.65k | £16.78k | £28.65k | £38.58k | £32.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.87k | £15.44k | £15.84k | £12.02k | £19.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 November 2020 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 November 2020 | 150 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH SEPTEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED 18TH SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED ON 13 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LEA).
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF ABBEY JMI SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Abbey C of E V A Primary School
Grove Road
ST. ALBANS
AL1 1DQ
- Phone:
- 01727851802
- Email:
- friends@abbey.herts.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window