THE STRATHSPEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to organisations operating in areas of Poverty, in many countries of the world, either directly or usually through other charities (Countries shown below are countries within which the beneficiary charities are located, but frequently the grants are solely for their work in a particular country in Africa, South America or Asia)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
- India
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 10 January 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN GILES BAKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Domin Hamilton | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER MICHAEL ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.10k | £23.12k | £30.73k | £33.61k | £33.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.96k | £55.65k | £31.55k | £26.58k | £27.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/05/1989 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 21/02/2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HUNGER BY PREFERENCE IN LANDS OVERSEAS BY GRANTS AND OTHER REGULAR DISBURSEMENTS OF MONEY TO CHARITIES LISTED IN THE TRUST DEED OR THE OTHER CHARITIES TO BE DETERMINED AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Taigh Fuinidh
Nethy Bridge
PH25 3DJ
- Phone:
- 08445868142
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window