DAVID GLASS NEW MIME ENSEMBLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
advance education by the encouragement of the arts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 July 1990: Standard registration
- 12 January 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DAVID GLASS ENSEMBLE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2005 | 28/02/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.40k | £214.79k | £236.47k | £257.55k | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £298.27k | £212.00k | £239.90k | £120.16k | £15.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 17 June 2010 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 07 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 31 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 29 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 13 May 2008 | 103 days late | |
Annual return | 28 February 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2006 | 13 April 2007 | 106 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF MIME, DRAMA, BALLET, MUSIC, SINGING, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE AND PAINTING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window