THE FESTIVAL PLAYERS, CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Performing musical theatre productions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 06 November 1989: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Lucas | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Brown | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helena Cornu | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ana Christina Sanderson | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Watson | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Clarke | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUSAN SADEK | Trustee | 23 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Fisher | Trustee | 01 October 2009 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Emerson | Trustee | 01 October 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.29k | £2.16k | £92 | £35.75k | £21.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.73k | £2.47k | £760 | £22.96k | £17.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 17 September 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 18 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 18 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1987 AS AMENDED 1ST OCTBER 1989 as amended on 24 Oct 1999 as amended on 27 Oct 2002 as amended on 26 Oct 2008 as amended on 28 Oct 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE GROUP SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, AND IN PARTICULAR, THE ARTS OF MUSIC AND DRAMA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE CAMBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Burnt Close
Eynesbury
ST. NEOTS
Cambridgeshire
PE19 2LZ
- Phone:
- 01480473223
- Website:
-
festivalplayers.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window