Financial history THE P T C TRUST

Charity number: 802322
Charity reporting is up to date (276 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £26.05k £20.18k £759 £104 £16.13k
Total expenditure £20.97k £18.76k £1.11m £3.21k £58.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A