MILTON KEYNES HINDU ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity aims to preserve and promote Hindu Culture. It provides Language and Dance classes for Children and Young people and organises religious and Cultural activities which it promotes in the wider community. It organises social and recreational activities for the Elderly. It raises funds for the establishment of a Hindu Community Centre in Milton Keynes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
83 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Milton Keynes
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 12 December 1989: Standard registration
- MKHA (Working name)
- SANATAN DHARMA VEDANT MANDIR (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Satmesh Panchal | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Manjula Koria | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Sunil Gandhi | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.85k | £45.21k | £62.28k | £85.29k | £139.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.55k | £35.09k | £29.35k | £40.31k | £143.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED 29TH JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE HINDU CULTURE AND RELIGION IN MILTON KEYNES AND ITS ENVIRONS 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONGST THE HINDU COMMUNITY AND PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN HINDU CULTURE AND RELIGION 3. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES OF PEOPLE RESIDENT IN MILTON KEYNES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
MILTON KEYNES AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
MKHA Community Centre
Ferry Meadows Close
Broughton
Milton Keynes
MK10 9QY
- Phone:
- 07808296452
- Email:
- info@mkha.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window