THE TALACRE ACTION GROUP LIMITED

Charity Number: 802347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Out of school activities for children aged 8-13 years.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £142,263
Total expenditure: £125,682

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 November 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • TAG (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER HORNE CHAIR Chair
None on record
June Davis Trustee
None on record
JOHN LIPPETZ Trustee
None on record
CATHERINE VIDAL Trustee
None on record
PAULETTE KING Trustee
None on record
MURIEL FOWLER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £140.05k £138.83k £176.87k £128.53k £142.26k
Total expenditure £142.49k £133.62k £164.06k £155.21k £125.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £97.11k £113.23k £105.31k £106.34k £100.42k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Talacre Action Group Ltd
Wilkin Street
LONDON
NW5 3AG
Phone:
0207 267 9755
Website:

No information available