FRIENDS OF STONE LODGE ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the association are to advance education of pupils by providing and assisting in provision of facilities for education (not normally provided by LEA). This to foster relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 17 November 1989: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 01 July 2010: Standard registration
- BEACON HILL SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Finbow | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Grant | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Reeder | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.80k | £4.68k | £2.94k | £1.78k | £2.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.74k | £1.76k | £2.15k | £773 | £4.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 October 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/09/1989 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01/02/2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF BEACON HILL SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE CATCHMENT AREA OF SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stone Lodge Academy
Stone Lodge Lane West
IPSWICH
IP2 9HW
- Phone:
- 01473 601175
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window