THE BRIT SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate as The BRIT School, the only free vocational school for the performing, visual and digital arts in the UK. We admit students into Years 10 and 12, selected on the basis of their aptitude for their intended specialism. Our catchment area consists of most of Greater London plus parts of suburban Surrey and Kent; we can also admit up to 10% of students from outside this area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2010
Total income:
£8,619,639
Donations and legacies | £330.60k | |
Charitable activities | £8.28m | |
Other trading activities | £788 | |
Investments | £6.63k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£8,004,796
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £7.85m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £151.25k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.85m | |
Retained for future use | £614.84k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 November 1989: Standard registration
- 25 August 2011: Removed (Exempt charity)
- BRIT KIDS (Working name)
- THE BRIT SCHOOL (Working name)
- LONDON SCHOOL FOR THE PERFORMING ARTS AND TECHNOLOGY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.29m | £6.99m | £8.24m | £10.48m | £8.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.57m | £6.15m | £6.92m | £7.45m | £8.00m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £474.32k | £333.28k | £327.56k | £330.60k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £1.91k | £3.02k | £2.50k | £788 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £6.47m | £7.78m | £10.07m | £8.28m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £45.06k | £119.97k | £85.94k | £6.63k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £6.01m | £6.72m | £7.29m | £7.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £110.94k | £170.43k | £131.68k | £120.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £9.16m | £9.94m | £13.05m | £13.56m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £4 | £4 | £4 | £4 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £1.86m | £2.57m | £3.34m | £2.17m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | -£833.00k | -£1.51m | -£1.56m | -£1.36m | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £384.57k | £533.26k | £1.37m | £423.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 20 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 25 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 16 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 22 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 22 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 29 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 03 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 10 January 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH APRIL 1989 AND RESOLUTION PASSED ON 9TH JULY 1998.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON AND DEVELOPING ONE OR MORE SECONDARY SCHOOLS OR COLLEGES OFFERING A BROAD CURRICULUM WITH A STRONG EMPHASIS ON THE PERFORMING ARTS AND RELATING TECHNOLOGY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window