'SIGNALS' ESSEX MEDIA CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Signals provides the opportunity for everyone to participate in media production. Through courses, exhibition, and projects. This work encourages participation & understanding & develops technical & personal skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 12 February 1990: Standard registration
- SIGNALS (Working name)
- SIGNALS MEDIA ARTS (Working name)
- COLCHESTER FILM AND VIDEO WORKSHOP LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBORAH ANN ROOME | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rebecca Winward | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mei-Fung Greenhalgh | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Davies | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Katherine Cotterill | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Saward | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julien Mery | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derek Wotton | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Nic Blower | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.28k | £121.84k | £151.28k | £171.35k | £208.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.57k | £124.77k | £147.51k | £147.73k | £163.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £23.56k | £4.16k | N/A | £20.76k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.30k | £58.70k | £4.40k | £1.75k | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH JULY 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 16 OCT 1989, 19 JUL 1990 AND 5 AUG 2010 as amended on 24 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING, APPRECIATION OF, AND PARTICIPATION IN DIGITAL ART, FILM AND MEDIA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
COLCHESTER AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
VICTORIA CHAMBERS
ST RUNWALD STREET
COLCHESTER
CO1 1HF
- Phone:
- 01206 580950
- Email:
- info@signals.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window