Financial history THE NICHOLAS YONGE SOCIETY

Charity number: 802393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £16.45k £1.12k £16.30k £15.01k £16.63k
Total expenditure £11.73k £2.23k £16.11k £16.33k £13.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A