THE FERNSIDE SCHOLARSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting families who are experiencing financial hardship whilst at the School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 November 1989: Standard registration
- 21 July 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 July 2021: Funds transferred to 312041 PARKSIDE SCHOOL TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.19k | £3.12k | £347 | £4.11k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.27k | £22.75k | £0 | £4.07k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 March 2021 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 23 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 28 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION ASSISTING WHETHER BY INTEREST FREE LOAN PAYMENT OF SCHOOL FEES OR OTHERWISE TO EDUCATE PUPILS AT PARKSIDE SCHOOL, STOKE D'ABERNON, SURREY ("PARKSIDE SCHOOL") WHOSE EDUCATION MIGHT OTHERWISE BE CURTAILED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL DIFFICULTIES OF THE PERSONS OTHERWISE RESPONSIBLE FOR THEIR SCHOOL FEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window