REACT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
REACT WORKS TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE BY PROVIDING BASIC ESSENTIAL AID AND EQUIPMENT TO FAMILIES CARING FOR A CHILD LIVING WITH A LIFE -LIMITED ILLNESS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£695,291
Donations and legacies | £684.25k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £11.05k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£753,837
Raising funds | £44.16k | |
Charitable activities | £709.68k | |
Other | £0 |
£7,963 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £44.16k | |
Charitable expenditure | £709.68k |
People

7 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 January 1990: Standard registration
- REACT (Working name)
- RAPID EFFECTIVE ASSISTANCE FOR CHILDREN WITH POTENTIALLY TERMINAL ILLNESS (Previous name)
- RESEARCH, EDUCATION AND AID FOR CHILDREN WITH POTENTIALLY TERMINAL ILLNESS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUPERT ANTONY WILES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Judy Burdett | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR Richard Clifford | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|||||
PAUL GRAHAM MELLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH RICHARD ENTWISLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £999.27k | £614.10k | £593.28k | £687.55k | £695.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £784.34k | £669.78k | £646.37k | £701.85k | £753.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £949.32k | £613.86k | £593.03k | £680.96k | £684.25k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £47.28k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.68k | £240 | £247 | £5.65k | £11.05k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £933 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £252.18k | £0 | £5.10k | £89.32k | £26.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £632.85k | £621.25k | £599.47k | £656.32k | £709.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £151.49k | £48.53k | £46.89k | £45.53k | £44.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.18k | £7.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £8.70k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.67k | £10.60k | £8.65k | £6.17k | £77.70k | |
|
Long-term investments | £355.37k | £458.76k | £433.26k | £423.51k | £414.26k | |
|
Other assets | £455.90k | £383.06k | £380.15k | £367.42k | £327.31k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £23.44k | £9.21k | £7.44k | £8.55k | £58.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 NOVEMBER 1989 AS VARIED BY A SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 31 OCTOBER 1990 AS VARIED BY DEEDS 25 AUGUST 1996, 31 MAY 1997, 8 AUGUST 2002, 31 JULY 2003 AND 9 AUGUST 2006, 25 FEBRUARY 2010 AND RESOLUTION DATED 13 SEPTEMBER 2010. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04/03/2015
Charitable objects
(I)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY PROMOTING THE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE CARE OF PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS, SUFFERING FROM POTENTIALLY TERMINAL ILLNESS. (II) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY PROMOTING THE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE CARE OF PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, SUFFERING FROM POTENTIALLY TERMINAL ILLNESS AND THE SUPPORT OF THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILIES; (III) TO CONDUCT OR PROMOTE THE EDUCATION TRAINING AND RESEARCH INTO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH PERSONS AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; AND (IV) THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT OR CARE OF SUCH PERSONS WHEN, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, SUCH EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES WILL NOT BE PROVIDED BY A HEALTH AUTHORITY OR A LOCAL AUTHORITY(V) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT IN CONNECTION WITH THE PAYMENT OF FUNERAL AND ASSOCIATED EXPENSES IN RESPECT OF THE FUNERALS OF VICTIMS OF POTENTIALLY TERMINAL ILLNESS, WHERE IT APPEARS THAT THE RESOURCES AVAILABLE MAKE IT REASONABLE TO PROVIDE SUCH FINANCIAL SUPPORT (VI)TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND ASSISTANCE IN CONNECTION WITH HOLIDAYS OR BREAKS FOR THOSE WHO NORMALLY CARE FOR THOSE SUFFERING FROM POTENTIALLY TERMINAL ILLNESS AND THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILIES (INCLUDING SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE RECENTLY CEASED SO CARING FOLLOWING THE DEATH OF A VICTIM OF POTENTIALLY TERMINAL ILLNESS) WHERE IT APPEARS THAT THE RESOURCES AVAILABLE MAKE IT REASONABLE TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE PURSUANT TO THIS OBJECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
REACT
Building 3
Chiswick Park
566 Chiswick High Road
LONDON
W4 5YA
- Phone:
- 02089402575
- Email:
- react@reactcharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window