Financial history GRAHAM ROWLANDSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 802446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £251.58k £51.50k £251.50k £251.50k £266.50k
Total expenditure £260.59k £96.41k £234.73k £258.36k £280.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A