Financial history WOODHALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 802459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £8.05k £3.85k £6.01k £5.70k £5.92k
Total expenditure £9.55k £7.97k £16.92k £5.07k £12.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A