DAVENTRY INFORMATION AND COUNSELLING SERVICE (TIME TO TALK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Free therapeutic counselling. Free condoms, pregnancy testing and Chlamydia screening, range of information and agents for local Food bank, services for those in the old Daventry District, South Northants areas of West Northants. Counselling is STRICTLY by appointment and we DO NOT provide emergency services. We work with those aged 13-18-up to 25 with a SEND. We don't offer home visits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £63,910 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 08 January 1990: Standard registration
- TIME 2 TALK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOCTOR SUSAN DAVIES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Julie Luvaglio | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNAH DION | Trustee | 04 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.26k | £138.96k | £256.00k | £254.03k | £181.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.89k | £124.20k | £156.46k | £148.51k | £236.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £112.17k | £63.91k | |
|
Income from government grants | £121.07k | £2.19k | N/A | £112.17k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/11/1989 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/1999 AS AMENDED ON 20/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 28/11/2011
Charitable objects
1) ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF THE PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL WELFARE OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED (5-25) WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM. 2) TO FACILITATE THE EDUCATION AND HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS FULFILLED CITIZENS AND THAT THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE BE IMPROVED. 3) PROVIDE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND SUPPORT TO YOUNG PEOPLE AND THOSE THAT CARE FOR THEM. 4) SUPPLY INFORMATION, GUIDANCE AND SERVICES TO YOUNG PEOPLE TO EMPOWER THEIR DECISION MAKING. 5) PROCURE TO BE WRITTEN, PRINT, PUBLISH AND ISSUE OR CIRCULATE GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE ANY REPORTS, PERIODICALS, BOOKS, PAMPHLETS OR OTHER DOCUMENTS IN THE FURTHERANCE OF YOUNG PEOPLE’S WELFARE. 6) ARRANGE AND PROVIDE FOR OR JOIN IN ARRANGING AND PROVIDING FOR THE HOLDING OF EXHIBITIONS, MEETINGS, LECTURES AND TRAINING COURSES TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF YOUNG PEOPLE. 7) PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE OR UNDERTAKE ORGANISED RESEARCH INTO YOUNG PEOPLE’S PHYSICAL OR EMOTIONAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
TIME2TALK
THE ABBEY
MARKET SQUARE
DAVENTRY
NORTHANTS
NN11 4XG
- Phone:
- 01327706706
- Email:
- info@time2talk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window