WORKFORCE CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
Governance
- 05 December 1989: Standard registration
- 26 July 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WORKFORCE (Working name)
- ACTION AND RESOURCES IN THE COMMUNITY FOR PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS (Previous name)
- HACKNEY YOUTH WORKFORCE (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 28TH MAY 1986 AS AMENDED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1989 BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS AMENDED 28TH MARCH 1991 AND 3 DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY THOSE WITH SPECIAL LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED BY PROVIDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND LIMITED PERIODS OF WORK EXPERIENCE.
Area of benefit
HACKNEY AND SURROUNDING BOROUGHS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window