Accounts and annual returns THE SUMMERFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 802493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window