Financial history THE SUMMERFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 802493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £360.58k £416.68k £321.93k £305.18k £325.14k
Total expenditure £815.01k £311.67k £365.56k £249.24k £225.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A