Accounts and annual returns EXTEND EXERCISE TRAINING LIMITED

Charity number: 802498
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 March 2023 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 March 2023 49 days late
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time