The Puffins Club (Dacorum Sports Club for Adults with Learning Disabilities)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides sporting activities for adults with learning disabilities in the Dacorum area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 06 December 1989: Standard registration
- THE PUFFINS (Working name)
- Dacorum Sports Club for Adults with Learning Disabilities (Previous name)
- DACORUM SPORTS CLUB FOR THE DISABLED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyn Dorothy Ann Doe | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raymond McKinnon | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annemarie Kelly | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Dixon | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vishva Vaid | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzannah Hart | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian William Doe | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Woof | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.37k | £2.27k | £441 | £953 | £2.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08k | £2.87k | £717 | £1.55k | £2.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 June 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 February 2022 | 249 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1981 AS AMENDED 21ST NOVEMBER 1989, 18TH MARCH 2000, 23RD NOVEMBER 2001 AND 18TH NOVEMBER 2005. as amended on 01 Dec 2018 as amended on 30 Nov 2019 as amended on 14 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, OF PHYSICAL RECREATION AND SPORT IN PARTICULAR IN THE DISTRICT OF DACORUM FOR PEOPLE HAVING A PHYSICAL, SENSORY OR MENTAL DISABILITY.
Area of benefit
THE DISTRICT OF DACORUM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Everyone Active
59 Park Road
Hemel Hempstead
Hertfordshire
HP1 1JS
- Phone:
- 07866152399
- Email:
- gill.mckinnon@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
puffinsportsclub.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window