Financial history CHARITY OF FREDERICK EDMUND GUNTRIP

Charity number: 802516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £10.84k £11.79k £13.10k £13.46k £14.11k
Total expenditure £10.33k £10.08k £10.79k £12.22k £14.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A