STREET SCENE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide treatment for people suffering from past or present addiction to drugs and/or alcohol. This is mostly residential treatment, however we do also offer a limited service for people living in the community. We also provide supported accommodation and after-care services. Although we are based in Bournemourth and Southampton we take clients from all over England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 January 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Martindale | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Corner | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Gormley | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Louise Leonard | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
LORD Timothy George Douglas Howson-Green | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66 | £63 | £9.00k | £6.93k | £12.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48 | £58 | £7.02k | £5.66k | £12.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 June 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 June 2022 | 411 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 7TH NOVEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 21 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION PARTICULARLY AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE ABOUT ALL MATTERS RELATING TO DRUG ABUSE. (II) TO RELIEVE AND REHABILITATE PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING OR HAVE SUFFERED FROM DRUG ADDICTION OR OTHER FORMS OF ADDITICTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Streetscene
108 Cobham Road
Ferndown Industrial Estate
WIMBORNE
BH21 7PQ
- Phone:
- 01202540337
- Email:
- tim@streetscene.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window