CHRIST CHURCH BRIXTON ROAD HALLS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity owns a property which it lets out. Net income generated is given as grant(s) to the Parish of Christ Church, Brixton Road to further their activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lambeth
Governance
- 16 July 1990: Standard registration
- CHRIST CHURCH HALL NORTH BRIXTON (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Hugo Federico Adan Fernandez | Chair | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Yepes Franco | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Grantham | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|||||
CHESTERFIELD HOLDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.70k | £44.57k | £44.47k | £44.89k | £46.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.25k | £73.66k | £32.33k | £3.92k | £2.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 17/12/1903 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/09/2013
Charitable objects
A CHURCH HALL TO BE USED FOR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (1) FOR THE CELEBRATION OF DIVINE SERVICE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RITES AND CEREMONIES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND (2) AS A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH (3) AS A CLASS ROOM, MEETING ROOM OR LECTURE ROOM FOR MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FOR CONFIRMATION OR COMMUNICANTS CLASSES OR FOR OTHER RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION OR FOR SECULAR INSTRUCTION UNDER THE CONTROL OF THE VICAR OF THE PARISH. (4) AS A PLACE OF MEETING FOR CLERICAL MEETINGS, FOR SOCIAL CONFERENCES OF THE CLERGY FOR DISTRICT VISITORS, FOR COMMITTEES OF ANY SOCIETIES PAROCHIAL OR OTHERWISE CONNECTED WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND (5) FOR ANY OTHER MEETING OR ANY OTHER OBJECTS, ENDS OR PURPOSES HAVING IN VIEW THE SPIRITUAL, INTELLECTUAL, MORAL OR SOCIAL WANTS OF PROFESSING MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH NORTH BRIXTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
90 BRIXTON ROAD
LONDON
SW9 6BE
- Phone:
- 02075870375
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window