Financial history SOUTH FARNHAM SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 802541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £381.90k £115.01k £231.80k £409.64k £515.17k
Total expenditure £279.83k £43.38k £139.59k £231.13k £233.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £483.83k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £31.34k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £221.84k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.10k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £221.84k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.35k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0