STAPLEHURST UNDER FIVE PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Staplehurst Under Five Playgroup is to enhance the development and education of the children primarily under statutory school age by offering appropriate play facilities and training courses for the staff, encouraging the study of the needs of such children and adhereing to and furthering the aims of the Pre-school learning Alliance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 17 January 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Brown | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Jones | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Gammon | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.25k | £47.36k | £49.96k | £55.80k | £56.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.91k | £50.68k | £45.51k | £53.02k | £60.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £37.92k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 June 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 June 2023 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 June 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 25 June 2022 | 25 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEPTEMBER 1989 AND AMENDED 8 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 05 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Staplehurst Under 5 Playgroup
Staplehurst Village Centre
2 High Street,Staplehurst
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN12 0BJ
- Phone:
- 07792 938947
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window