SHREE PRAJAPATI ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity organises various fundraising activities such as sporting events, women's groups, youth activities, etc. It provides grants to individuals and organisations, mainly from the Prajapati community, for the purpose of furthering their education and for the relief of poverty and sickness. Also supports diaster relief
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 19 January 1990: Standard registration
- SHREE PRAJAPATI SAMAJ (UK) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jasumati Mistry | Chair | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirti B Mistry | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shashikant Mistry | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kantilal D Mistry | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jitendra Chhaganlal Mistry | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Champakbhai Fakira | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Champakbhai A Mistry | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arunbhai A Mistry | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Varshaben Mistry | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Balubhai D Mistry | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohanbhai A Mistry | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arunaben Bipin Mistry | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
NATWARBHAI JAGABHAI LAD | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Vasant Khandubhai Mistry | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Bhupendra Mistry | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Yogeshkumar Mistry | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bhikhubhai Vallabh Mistry | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bharatbhai Mistry | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pravin G Mistry | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.93k | £21.23k | £96.15k | £42.59k | £52.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.89k | £16.89k | £82.42k | £43.15k | £69.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/05/1989 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND HINDU RELIGION AND CULTURE AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG THE PRAJAPATI COMMUNITY AND PROMOTION OF WELLBEING TO THE COMMUNITIES AFFECTED BY NATURAL DISASTERS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION'S OBJECTS)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 GIFFORD CLOSE
LEICESTER
LE5 6FG
- Phone:
- 07982260176
- Email:
- jitumistry@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window