WOKING MOBILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide mobility scooters within the Woking shopping center
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 05 April 1990: Standard registration
- WOKING SHOPMOBILITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR PAT MAGUIRE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Adrian Arthur Whitehead | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Maguire | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Norma Empringham | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colin Orbaum | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Louise Nairn | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Eastwood | Trustee | 17 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE MORRIS | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
HILARY ADDISON | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS TERREY EVANS FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Anne Ansell | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELAINE EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.95k | £53.95k | £38.79k | £21.85k | £147.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.21k | £48.90k | £50.74k | £50.83k | £46.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.50k | £12.50k | £12.50k | £11.25k | £11.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ALL DISABLED PERSONS WITHIN WOKING AND DISTICT BY IMPROVING THEIR MOBILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF WHEELCHAIRS AND OTHER EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
WOKING AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
CEDARDALE
HEATHER CLOSE
WOKING
GU21 4JR
- Phone:
- 01483770449
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window