Financial history PRUDENCE PENN CHARITY

Charity number: 802600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £2.32k £2.15k £2.05k £2.14k £2.46k
Total expenditure £5.10k £454 £226 £2.45k £2.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A