CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND, LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CPRE London exists to advocate and influence the sustainable use and stewardship of land and other natural resources in order to protect and enhance the environment and quality of life in London - and the wider English countryside - for the benefit of all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £17,460 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 January 1990: Standard registration
- CPRE LONDON (Working name)
- THE CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND (LONDON BRANCH) (Previous name)
- THE COUNCIL FOR THE PROTECTION OF RURAL ENGLAND (LONDON BRANCH) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Elizabeth Wise | Chair | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Robert William Pomphrett | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Owen Anderson | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Ian Ashman | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Catherine Irving | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.91k | £122.81k | £183.06k | £124.21k | £173.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.43k | £120.24k | £157.89k | £150.80k | £176.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £53.00k | £62.25k | £35.57k | £17.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 OCTOBER 1989 AS AMENDED ON 14TH NOVEMBER 1996 AND 29 NOVEMBER 2004 as amended on 13 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE IMPROVEMENT AND PROTECTION OF THE ENGLISH COUNTRYSIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH INFLUENCING THE WAY THAT LAND AND OTHER NATURAL RESOURCES ARE USED IN GREATER LONDON.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
C P R E LONDON
70-74 COWCROSS STREET
LONDON
EC1M 6EJ
- Phone:
- 02072530300
- Email:
- office@cprelondon.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window