QUILTERS PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School fetes, shopping trips, disco's, inflatable afternoons, ball
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 19 January 1990: Standard registration
- QUILTERS P T A (Working name)
- QUILTERS JUNIOR AND INFANTS SCHOOLS SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tiina Tanav | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Teresa Warner | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Ball | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terence Benjamin Wood | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Nicole Blyth | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.80k | £120.18k | £85.86k | £49.26k | £111.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.44k | £109.34k | £102.41k | £45.39k | £73.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 305 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 February 2025 | 590 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 February 2025 | 590 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2024 | 633 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 March 2024 | 633 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1970 AS AMENDED 27 SEPTEMBER 1983 AND 19 OCTOBER 1993 as amended on 23 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOLS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOLS (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Quilters Junior School
Laindon Road
BILLERICAY
Essex
CM12 9LD
- Phone:
- 07946324859
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window