THE IAN REID CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Focuses on making grants to charities who meet at least one of the following criteria: 1) Promote Christian message and values, both in UK and overseas 2) Overcome long term causes of poverty 3) Relieve suffering and poverty in UK or overseas 4) Have low overheads and fundraising costs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 November 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 January 1990: Standard registration
- 27 March 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/11/2014 | 22/11/2015 | 22/11/2016 | 22/11/2017 | 22/11/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.33k | £1.17k | £890 | £661 | £235 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.70k | £7.00k | £4.35k | £10.40k | £10.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 November 2018 | 16 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 November 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 November 2017 | 23 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 November 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 November 2016 | 20 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 November 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 November 2015 | 09 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 November 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND NOVEMBER 1988 AND DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 15TH DECEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE SUCH DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window