Accounts and annual returns BLACK PERSPECTIVES IN VOLUNTEERING GROUP LIMITED

Charity Number: 802652
Charity reporting is overdue by 839 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 839 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 839 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 December 2022 311 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2022 676 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required