Accounts and annual returns PAINTBOX PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 802672
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 February 2021 On Time